Synovus Bank v. Rantzos et al

Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Defendant: Kostas N. Rantzos and Emily A. Rantzos
Case Number: 1:2011cv00191
Filed: July 29, 2011
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Henderson
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss; parties to conduct an initial attorneys' conference within 14 days. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/15/12. (ejb)
March 13, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Motion for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Present Consolidated Motions for Pro Hac Vice Admission by Synovus Bank (Doc. 77 filed in case no. 1:11cv66). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/12/13. (nll)
March 27, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added T. William McGee, III for Synovus Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/27/13. (ejb)
April 10, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Timothy Ryan Langley for Emily A. Rantzos and Kostas N. Rantzos. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 04/09/13. (emw)
July 8, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 07/05/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
July 11, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 07/11/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Rantzos et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: W. Carleton Metcalf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kostas N. Rantzos
Represented By: John Elliott Rogers, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily A. Rantzos
Represented By: John Elliott Rogers, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]