Houey et al v. TD Bank, N.A.

Defendant: TD Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Helen Cliette Houey and Emmanuel Houey
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00225
Filed: September 8, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Cleveland
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 10 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying without prejudice 12 Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale. The plaintiffs may file response to TD Bank's motion to Dismiss 7 on or before 15 days from entry of this Order.. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/8/2011. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(pdf)
November 14, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall not be required to participate in mediation as set forth in the 11 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan previously entered in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/14/11. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
November 28, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that each of the following documents are hereby STRICKEN from the record: 22 MOTION to Substitute Party, 23 Reply to Response to Motion, 24 MOTION for Emergency Injunctive Relief. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/28/2011. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(pdf)
April 2, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 40 Suggestion of Bankruptcy Upon the Record: the Court DIRECTS parties to Show Cause in writing by 4/13/2012 whether this case is subject to automatic stay pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362 or whether as an action brought by debtor, case may proceed in this forum simultaneously with bankruptcy proceeding. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 4/2/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
September 17, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on or before 15 business days from entry of this Order, Pltfs shall advise the Court in writing of their intention to pursue or to dismiss this action. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/13/12. (Pro se litigants served by US Mail.) (ejb)
October 30, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Pltfs' 53 Motion for Attachment Lien and 54 Motion for Quiet Title Action; granting Pltfs' 59 Motion for Extension of Time construed by the Court as a motion to continue, and action CONTINUED from Nov. trial term; denying Michelle Smith's 60 Motion to Intervene; parties to respond on or before 45 days from entry of this order to issue re: Consent Order entered on 9/12/12 in US Bankruptcy Court. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/29/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
February 5, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 Motion for Summary Judgment and action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/4/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
February 5, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Carolina First Bank and TD Bank, N.A. against Emmanuel Houey, Helen Cliette Houey. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/4/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
April 1, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 73 Motion to Intervene, Motion for Extension of Time, MOTION for Relief and MOTION to Request Assistance from Court. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/30/13. (Pro se litigants served by US Mail.) (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Houey et al v. TD Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Lance P. Martin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Cliette Houey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Houey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]