Synovus Bank v. Holmlund et al

Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Defendant: Thomas Robert Holmlund and Antoinette Holmlund
Case Number: 1:2011cv00328
Filed: December 8, 2011
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Alexander
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5 Motion to Dismiss; granting 6 Motion to Dismiss; parties to conduct an initial attorneys' conference within 14 days. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/15/12. (ejb)
March 13, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Motion for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Present Consolidated Motions for Pro Hac Vice Admission by Synovus Bank (Doc. 77 filed in case no. 1:11cv66). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/12/13. (nll)
March 27, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added T. William McGee, III for Synovus Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/27/13. (ejb)
July 11, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/11/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
August 2, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Tara Cloer Sullivan for Synovus Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 08/01/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
August 22, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall have 30 days from the entry of this Order in which to file a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 08/22/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Holmlund et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: Steven Brent McFarland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Robert Holmlund
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoinette Holmlund
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]