Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Greenwood et al

Defendant: David N. Wilcox, G. Gordon Greenwood, W. Edward Anderson, Steven D. Cogburn, Darryl J. Hart, Carol L. King and Steven L. Pignatiello
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00337
Filed: December 29, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the Court suspends the current 27 Scheduling Order deadlines pending resolution of dispositive motions in the Anderson case (1:12-cv-156). The Court will issue new scheduling order at the appropriate time. Signed by Henry M. Herlong, Jr on 10/31/12. (ejb)
January 30, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE until further order. Signed by Henry M. Herlong, Jr on 1/30/13. (nll)
April 8, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER parties to inform the court of mediator selected within two weeks, ( Mediation deadline set for 7/8/2013, Informal Discovery due by 7/8/2013 ). Signed by Henry M. Herlong, Jr on 4/8/13. (nll)
August 23, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Senior Judge Henry M. Herlong, Jr on 8/22/13. (nll)
August 23, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 8/23/13. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Greenwood et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David N. Wilcox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Gordon Greenwood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Edward Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven D. Cogburn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl J. Hart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol L. King
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven L. Pignatiello
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: John Francis Bloss, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]