United States of America v. $4,700.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $4,700.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Jerimy Dennis
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00180
Filed: July 30, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Haywood
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:841
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 05/08/2013. (thh)
May 10, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against $4,700.00 in United States Currency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 05/10/2013. (thh)
September 13, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for permission to file a claim of interest nunc pro tunc September 5, 2012 (See Order for Further Details). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 09/13/2012. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. $4,700.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas R. Ascik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,700.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jerimy Dennis
Represented By: Brad Harrison Ferguson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]