United States of America v. 3338 Bat Cave Road, Old Fort, McDowell County, North Carolina

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 3338 Bat Cave Road, Old Fort, McDowell County, North Carolina
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00223
Filed: August 9, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: McDowell
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 21:841
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER denying 24 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 5/13/13. (nll)
May 28, 2013 26 Featured Case PARTIAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE granting 18 Motion for Summary Judgment and the Verified Claim and Amended Answer of the Lavenders are hereby DISMISSED and Partial Judgment of Forfeiture is hereby ENTERED in favor of the Uni ted States of America as to any and all claims of Margaret Gilliam Lavender and Donald C. Lavender in the subject property. FURTHER ORDERED no relief having been sought as to any other individuals or entities, none is given. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/25/2013. (thh) Modified text on 5/28/2013 (ejb). NEF Regenerated.
August 16, 2013 30 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT, ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, AND FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE in favor of United States against 3338 Bat Cave Road, Old Fort, McDowell County, North Carolina. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/16/13. (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. 3338 Bat Cave Road, Old Fort, McDowell County, North Carolina
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas R. Ascik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3338 Bat Cave Road, Old Fort, McDowell County, North Carolina
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]