Merichem Company v. Davis et al

Plaintiff: Merichem Company
Defendant: Gerald Davis and Summit Catalyst, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00282
Filed: September 11, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Madison
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2013 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 106 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Mini Kapoor for Merichem Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 4/1/13. (nll)
September 14, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Dean J. Schaner for Merichem Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 09/13/2012. (thh)
September 14, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Janet Haneen Ayyad for Merichem Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 09/13/2012. (thh)
September 14, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Matthew Deffebach for Merichem Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 09/13/2012. (thh)
May 10, 2013 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 186 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Polly B. Graham for Merichem Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 05/09/2013. (thh)
May 20, 2013 205 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION in favor of Merichem Company against Summit Catalyst, LLC, and Gerald Davis. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/20/2013. (khm)
October 11, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for for Leave to Take Expedited Discovery (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/10/2012. (thh)
October 18, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/18/12. (nll)
October 26, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Set Deadlines as to 31 MOTION to Compel Expedited Discovery.(Responses due by 11/5/2012). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/26/12. (bsw)
November 7, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion to Compel Expedited Discovery. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/6/12. (nll)
November 13, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 38 Miscellaneous Filing. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/12/12. (nll)
January 8, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Donald D. Jackson for Merichem Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/8/13. (nll)
February 22, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 58 and 60 Motion to Seal Documents. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/22/2013. (thh)
March 19, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 93 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Elizabeth Klingensmith for Merichem Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/19/13. (nll)
March 19, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 88 Motion for Leave to File Instanter. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/19/13. (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Merichem Company v. Davis et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merichem Company
Represented By: Matthew Deffebach
Represented By: Mary Cabell Clay
Represented By: Janet Haneen Ayyad
Represented By: Paul Javier Peralta
Represented By: Dean J. Schaner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Davis
Represented By: W. Andrew Copenhaver
Represented By: James A. Dean
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Catalyst, LLC
Represented By: W. Andrew Copenhaver
Represented By: James A. Dean
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]