Bradley v. Baxter Healthcare Corporation et al

Defendant: Baxter Healthcare Corporation and Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC
Plaintiff: Eugene Allen Bradley
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00312
Filed: October 1, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Haywood
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before April 1, 2013, the Defendant Pharmacia & Upjohn Company, L.L.C. shall file a response disclosing the names and citizenships, if any, of all the constituent members or partners of the above referenced LL C and for any such constituent members or partner that are limited liability companys or partnerships to identify the citizenships of the respective constituent members or partners until all such constituents are fully identified. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/14/13. (nll)
April 1, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kimberly Bessiere Martin for Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 4/1/13. (nll)
May 8, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Carrie Meade Hartfield for Baxter Healthcare Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 5/8/13. (nll)
May 8, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added J. Carter Thompson, Jr for Baxter Healthcare Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 5/8/13. (nll)
November 6, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting 25 Memorandum and Recommendation; granting 9 Defendant Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC's Motion to Dismiss. FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff and the remaining Defendant, Baxter Healthcare Corporati on, shall conduct an initial attorneys conference within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order and file a certificate of initial attorneys conference within seven (7) days thereafter. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/6/2013. (khm)
January 22, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall file a report identifying their selected mediator within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/22/2014. (khm)
August 13, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 34 Joint Status Report. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 08/13/2014. (klb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bradley v. Baxter Healthcare Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter Healthcare Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Allen Bradley
Represented By: Robert Joseph Lopez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]