Watkins et al v. Soprema, Inc. et al

Defendant: Soprema, Inc. and Elastikote, LLC
Plaintiff: David Watkins and Maureen Watkins
Case Number: 1:2012cv00318
Filed: October 5, 2012
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Transylvania
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Daniel A. Richards for Soprema, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/1/12. (ejb)
November 1, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Paul M. Shipp for Soprema, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/1/12. (ejb)
November 7, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting motions 17 18 . The Court extends the time for conducting the Rule 26(f) Conference to November 16, 2012. Plaintiffs shall have until November 19, 2012, to file a response to the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/07/2012. (thh)
November 19, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before December 10, 2012, the Defendant Elastikote, LLC shall file a response disclosing the names and citizenships (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/19/2012. (thh)
April 29, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Deft Elastikote, LLC's 42 Motion to Dismiss Count Six of Pltfs' Complaint, and Pltfs' claim of fraud against Elastikote is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/25/13. (ejb) Modified text on 4/29/2013 (ejb).
August 16, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall provide a status report within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order advising the Court of the result of the parties mediation. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 08/15/13. (emw)
March 27, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER AND OPINION granting 53 and 85 Defendant Soprema's Motion for Summary Judgment as supplemented; denied as moot 71 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/27/2014. (thh)
March 31, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Memorandum Order and Opinion dated 3/27/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins et al v. Soprema, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soprema, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Michael Shipp
Represented By: Daniel A. Richards
Represented By: Steven Ari Meckler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elastikote, LLC
Represented By: Tracy L. Eggleston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Watkins
Represented By: James M. Kimzey
Represented By: Emily L. Nenni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Watkins
Represented By: James M. Kimzey
Represented By: Emily L. Nenni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]