Watson et al v. U.S. Gear Tools, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Teresa Watson and Richard Watson
Defendant: U.S. Gear Tools, Inc. and Micromatic LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00337
Filed: October 25, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 01/10/14. (emw)
November 15, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Douglas P. Desjardins for Richard Watson and Teresa Watson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/15/2012. (thh)
November 27, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before December 15, 2012, the Defendant Micromatic LLC shall file a response disclosing the names and citizenships (See Order for Further Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/27/2012. (thh)
March 29, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/29/13. (nll)
August 14, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Motion to Seal Document. Sealed Document 46 shall remain under seal until further Order of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 08/14/13. (emw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Watson et al v. U.S. Gear Tools, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Watson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kendal Stahl
Represented By: Douglas Peter Desjardins
Represented By: Joseph Lafayette Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Watson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kendal Stahl
Represented By: Douglas Peter Desjardins
Represented By: Joseph Lafayette Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Gear Tools, Inc.
Represented By: Garrick Alcarez Sevilla
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Scott
Represented By: Christopher Grafflin Browning, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micromatic LLC
Represented By: Christopher Grafflin Browning, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Scott
Represented By: Garrick Alcarez Sevilla
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]