USA v. One 2008 Mercedes C300

Claimant: Randy G. Hullette
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One 2008 Mercedes C300
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00380
Filed: November 26, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Burke
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 Motion to Stay. The Court STAYS these proceedings for 120 days. After the expiration of 120 days, the stay shall automatically dissolve unless the Government can show by motion (accompanied by a status report) reasons why the stay should not be lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 02/21/13. (emw)
June 24, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion to Stay for an additional thirty days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 06/24/2013. (thh)
August 21, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion to Stay. The Court Stays this case for an additional sixty days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 08/21/13. (emw)
October 28, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 17 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/28/2013. (thh)
October 30, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER that the parties shall conduct an initial attorneys' conference on or before 11/4/2013 and shall filed a certificate of initial attorneys' conference with the Court no later than 11/11/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/30/2013. (thh)
November 21, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion to Dismiss. This action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/20/13. (emw)
November 21, 2013 23 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 11/21/13. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 11/21/13. (emw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: USA v. One 2008 Mercedes C300
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Randy G. Hullette
Represented By: Sean P. Devereux
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Benjamin Bain-Creed
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2008 Mercedes C300
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]