Mader v. Martin

Defendant: Jeffrey Dean Martin
Plaintiff: Barbara Ewa Mader
Case Number: 1:2013cv00032
Filed: February 5, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall file a report identifying their selected mediator within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/12/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nll)
June 20, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 24 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 06/19/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
July 29, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/29/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nll)
August 29, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 41 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 50 Motion for Extension of Time to file Protective Order; denying without prejudice 33 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/29/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
October 15, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 53 Motion to Increase the Amount of Interrogatories to 25. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/15/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
January 13, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 01/10/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
February 5, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within 30 days; and denying as moot Plaintiff's Petition and Order for Relief from Obligation to Pay Mediator's Fee [Doc. 63-1]. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/5/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
March 21, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 65 Settlement Agreement is STRICKEN from the record. The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/21/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mader v. Martin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Dean Martin
Represented By: Jack W. Stewart, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ewa Mader
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]