United States of America v. MacAlpine

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: James E. MacAlpine
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00053
Filed: February 28, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion to Accept Over Length Opposition to Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss; striking Deft's 12 Objection to Summary Judgment and a Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice; and Deft has 14 days from entry of this Order to file brief not exceeding 25 pages, in response to Govs Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/1/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
November 6, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion to Accept Objection to Summary Judgment and a Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Rev 1 Errata. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/06/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (emw)
April 8, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 19 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Counterclaim; denying as moot 20 Defendant's Motion for Trial by Jury ; granting 24 Defendant's Motion to Strike (Disregard) ; denying as moot 25 Defendant's Motion for Leave of Court to File a Surreply. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/07/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
April 8, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against James E. MacAlpine. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/07/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
June 12, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion to Vacate ORDER for Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/11/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. MacAlpine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lawrence Paul Blaskopf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. MacAlpine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]