Brown v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Benjamin R. Brown
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00059
Filed: March 6, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Henderson
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Pltf's 10 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Dft's 13 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 07/01/2014. (klb)
July 2, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 07/01/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (klb)
August 26, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 08/26/2014. (klb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brown v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin R. Brown
Represented By: Charlotte Williams Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]