Pressley et al v. Bird Brain, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dean Pressley and Sandra Pressley
Defendant: Bird Brain, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00060
Filed: March 7, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Haywood
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as premature 17 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/30/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw) (Main Document 18 replaced on 5/30/2013) (emw). NEF regenerated.
July 29, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Set Aside Default. Defendant Bird Brain shall file its Answer to the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint within 10 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 07/29/2013. (thh)
February 26, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion to Stay; granting 41 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/26/14. (nll)
April 4, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Matthew R. Chapman for Dean Pressley,Matthew R. Chapman for Sandra Pressley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 04/04/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pressley et al v. Bird Brain, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Pressley
Represented By: Scott M. Anderson
Represented By: Matthew R. Chapman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Pressley
Represented By: Matthew R. Chapman
Represented By: Scott M. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bird Brain, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Gregory Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]