Henslee v. Singleton

Plaintiff: Jonathan Henslee
Defendant: FNU Singleton
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00090
Filed: March 25, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Avery
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pltf's 1 Complaint, survives initial review under § 1915(e) and 28 U.S.C. § 1915A; denying Pltf's 4 Motion for Writ, and 10 Motion for Default Judgment; US Marshal shall attempt to effectuate service on Deft. using the summons form provided by Pltf. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/12/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
May 13, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as premature 22 Motion to Compel; granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. FNU Singleton answer due 6/30/2014. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 5/13/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
June 2, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. on 6/2/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
July 28, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Motions 32 Motion Seeking Fact-Finder; 36 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; 37 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; 38 Motion to Compel to Produce. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 07/28/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
August 15, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 44 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 8/15/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nv)
October 7, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Pltf's 40 Motion For Subpoena Duces Tecum, 50 Motion to Reconsider, for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, and 53 Motion to Compel Discovery. Deft not required to respond to any further discovery requests from Pltf at this time. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 10/7/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
November 21, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 Motion To Proceed With A Jury Trial. The deadline for filing dispositive motions under this Court's scheduling order is December 22, 2014. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 11/21/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Henslee v. Singleton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Henslee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Singleton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]