Howell et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al

Defendant: Grinnell, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Hercules, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Crosby Valve, Inc., Crane Co. - Chempump, Crane Co., Covil Corporation, A.W. Chesterton, Inc., Benjamin Foster, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Champlain Cable Company, CNA Holdings, Inc., Ametek, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Crane Co. - Stockham Valve, ITT Corporation, BW/IP International, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, International Paper Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Riley Power, Inc, Union Carbide Corporation, U.S. Plywood-Champion Papers, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Vimasco Corporation, Yarway Corporation and Zurn Industries
Plaintiff: Richard N. Howell and Esther L. Howell
Cross_claimant: A.W. Chesterton, Inc.
Cross_defendant: A.W. Chesterton, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00100
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Cleveland
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 102 Stipulation of Dismissal (construes as a Joint Motion to Dismiss) and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against the FMC Corporation on behalf of its former subsidiary Crosby Valve, Inc., improperly sued as Crosby Valve, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/15/2014. (thh)
March 17, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 101 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant Benjamin Foster, Division of Amchem Products, Inc., and the Defendant ITT Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/15/2014. (thh)
March 17, 2014 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 98 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant A.W. Chesterton Company and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant A.W. Chesterton Company and all cross-claims asserted by A.W. Chesterton Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/15/2014. (thh)
March 17, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 99 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant BW/IP, Inc. and its wholly owned subsidiaries, incorrectly named in the Complaint as BW/IP International, Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to Byron Jackson Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/15/2014. (thh)
March 17, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 100 Motion to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendants Crane Co.; Crane Co., individually and as successor-in-interest to Chempump; and Crane Co., individually and as successor-in-interest to Stockham Valve. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/15/2014. (khm)
March 21, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 108 Joint Motion to Dismiss all of Pltfs' claims against Deft Metropolitan Life Insurance Company without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/21/14. (ejb)
March 24, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 111 Motion to Dismiss all of the Plaintiffs claims against the Defendant Velan Valve Corp without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/24/14. (emw)
March 24, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 110 Motion to Dismiss all of the Plaintiffs claims against the Defendant Industrial Holdings Corporation f/k/a The Carborundum Company without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/24/14. (emw)
March 24, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 109 Motion to Dismiss all Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. without prejuduce. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/24/2014. (khm)
April 4, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 116 Motion to Dismiss all Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Ametek, Inc., Champlain Cable Corporation, Hercules Incorporated, and Riley Power, Inc. without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/4/2014. (tmg)
May 8, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall provide a status report within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order advising the Court of the result of the parties' mediation. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/08/14. (emw)
May 8, 2014 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 118 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant Vimasco Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/08/14. (emw)
May 15, 2014 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 125 Joint Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant Union Carbide Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Union Carbide Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment 119 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/15/2014. (thh)
May 20, 2014 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that within 14 days of entry of this Order, Pltfs and each of the settling Defts shall file a memorandum of settlement with the Court which may be filed under seal; denying as moot 121 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion hearing scheduled for June 19, 2014 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/20/14. (emw) Modified text on 5/20/2014 (ejb). NEF Regenerated.
August 8, 2014 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 134 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant Goulds Pumps Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 08/08/14. (emw)
September 8, 2014 145 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 09/05/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (klb)
April 12, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Roderick Scott Marshall for Esther L. Howell & Richard N. Howell. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/11/13. (ejb)
June 13, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Reynaldo Fernandez for Esther L. Howell,Reynaldo Fernandez for Richard N. Howell. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/12/13. (nll)
July 22, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added E. Elaine Shofner for Ametek, Inc.,E. Elaine Shofner for Champlain Cable Company,E. Elaine Shofner for Hercules, Inc.,E. Elaine Shofner for Riley Power, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 07/22/2013. (thh)
August 8, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before August 29, 2013, the Defendants Grinnell LLC and Zurn Industries, LLC shall file a response disclosing the names and citizenships, if any, of all the constituent members or partners of the above referenced LLCs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 08/08/2013. (thh)
August 26, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added S. Christopher Collier for CNA Holdings, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 08/26/2013. (thh)
August 30, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 74 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Elisabeth Cheatham Bond for Ametek, Inc.,Champlain Cable Company,Hercules, Inc., and Riley Power, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 08/30/13. (emw)
September 12, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Daniel Bowman White for Covil Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 09/11/2013. (thh)
September 12, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Frances Groberg Zacher for Covil Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 09/11/2013. (thh)
November 22, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Randi M. Warren for Ametek, Inc., Champlain Cable Company, Hercules, Inc.,and Riley Power, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/21/13. (emw)
December 3, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 Motion to Dismiss all of the Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Covil Corporation without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/03/13. (emw)
January 9, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting without prejudice 88 Motion to Dismiss all claims of the Plaintiffs against the Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC (incorrectly identified in the Complaint as Zurn Industries). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 01/08/14. (emw)
January 9, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting without prejudice 89 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 01/08/14. (emw)
February 19, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 92 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Moffatt G. McDonald for Benjamin Foster, Goulds Pumps, Inc., ITT Corporation, & Union Carbide Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/19/14. (ejb)
February 19, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 93 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Scott E. Frick for Benjamin Foster, Goulds Pumps, Inc., ITT Corporation & Union Carbide Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/19/14. (ejb)
February 19, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 94 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added W. David Conner for Benjamin Foster, Goulds Pumps, Inc., ITT Corporation & Union Carbide Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/19/14. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Howell et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hercules, Inc.
Represented By: Teresa E. Lazzaroni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co. - Chempump
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covil Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Foster
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champlain Cable Company
Represented By: Teresa E. Lazzaroni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Holdings, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ametek, Inc.
Represented By: Teresa E. Lazzaroni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co. - Stockham Valve
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP International, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W. Bouch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Mark Andrew Leach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Keith E. Coltrain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc
Represented By: Teresa E. Lazzaroni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Plywood-Champion Papers, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vimasco Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarway Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard N. Howell
Represented By: Roderick Scott Marshall
Represented By: William M. Graham
Represented By: Cathy Anne Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther L. Howell
Represented By: William M. Graham
Represented By: Roderick Scott Marshall
Represented By: Cathy Anne Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: A.W. Chesterton, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: A.W. Chesterton, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]