United States of America v. $28,720.00 in United States Currency

Claimant: Sandra Isabel Rodriguez and Fernando Gonzalez
Defendant: $28,720.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2013cv00106
Filed: April 17, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Alexander
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:841
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Compel Claimant's Appearance at Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 4/17/14. (ejb)
May 5, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion for Reconsideration re 16 Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 5/5/14. (ejb)
July 28, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/28/14. (nv)
October 20, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/20/2014. (nv)
October 20, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against all persons and entities in the world against the Defendant Property $28,720.00 in United States Currency. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/20/2014. (nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $28,720.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sandra Isabel Rodriguez
Represented By: Jack W. Stewart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Fernando Gonzalez
Represented By: Jack W. Stewart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $28,720.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas R. Ascik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.