Automation System Integrators, Inc. et al v Bryan Concrete & Excavation Inc et al

Counter_defendant: Automation System Integrators, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Bryan Concrete & Excavation Inc
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company and BCE, Inc.
Plaintiff: Automation System Integrators, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00132
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: XX, Outside State
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/18/13. (nll)
July 2, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Consolidating this case with 1:12cv250 for purposes of pretrial deadlines only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 07/01/2013. (thh)
November 8, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 41 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 50 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot 53 Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/7/2013. (khm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Automation System Integrators, Inc. et al v Bryan Concrete & Excavation Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Automation System Integrators, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Alexander Stark
Represented By: W. James Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Bryan Concrete & Excavation Inc
Represented By: Steven James Strawbridge
Represented By: Ann-Patton Hornthal
Represented By: Daniel Patrick King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven James Strawbridge
Represented By: Daniel Patrick King
Represented By: Ann-Patton Hornthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCE, Inc.
Represented By: Ann-Patton Hornthal
Represented By: Daniel Patrick King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automation System Integrators, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Alexander Stark
Represented By: W. James Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.