Legon v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Judson Reimer Legon
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00144
Filed: May 22, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 9 10 and 11 MOTIONS for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines. Plaintiff SS Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/4/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/18/13. (emw)
January 9, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REMAND granting 15 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) with Reversal and Remand to Commissioner of Social Security for further administrative proceedings. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/8./14. (ejb)
January 9, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order of Remand dated 1/9/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (ejb)
February 24, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Payment of Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/24/2014. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Legon v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judson Reimer Legon
Represented By: V. Lamar Gudger, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]