Chambers v. Mega Manufacturing, Inc., et al

Defendant: AllSteel and Mega Manufacturing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Angela Faye Chambers
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00232
Filed: August 22, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: XX, Outside State
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added H. Cooper Wilson, III for Mega Manufacturing, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/19/13. (emw)
January 16, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that within 14 days of the entry of this Order, the Plaintiff shall file an appropriate motion or otherwise take further action with respect to Defendant Allsteel. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/15/2014. (khm)
January 27, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Allsteel without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/27/2014. (khm)
February 24, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/24/2014. (thh)
August 26, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kendall Dunson for Angela Faye Chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/26/2013. (khm) Modified Judge on 8/26/2013 (khm). NEF Regenerated.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Chambers v. Mega Manufacturing, Inc., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AllSteel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mega Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Holmes Hood, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Faye Chambers
Represented By: Kendall C. Dunson
Represented By: Brian Leighton Kinsley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]