Weber v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.

Plaintiff: David Weber
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00174
Filed: July 8, 2014
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Harlan I. Prater, IV for Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/6/2014. (klb)
August 11, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Marchello D. Gray for Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 08/11/2014. (thh)
February 27, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion to Stay. The Court STAYS these proceedings for ninety (90) days. Upon the lifting of the stay the Court will address extending the deadlines in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 02/27/2015. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weber v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Weber
Represented By: Thomas S. Babel
Represented By: William S. Durr
Represented By: Lynwood P. Evans(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeremy M. Wilson(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Paul Joseph Osowski
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.