United States of America v. Ball et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jody S. Ball and The Tax Lady, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv00026
Filed: October 14, 2010
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Bryson City Office
County: Swain
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER joint Motion for Pretrial Conference contained in the 9 Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan is GRANTED, and an (Initial Pretrial Conference is set for 12/10/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/2/10. (ejb)
December 8, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion to Appear By Telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/8/10. (nll)
December 10, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Cancel Initial Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/9/10. (nll)
February 10, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Stipulated Order of Permanent Injunction dated 2/10/11. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Ball et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Russell J. Edelstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody S. Ball
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Tax Lady, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]