Moss et al v. Nellis et al

Defendant: Birches of Wildcat Cliffs, LLC, Pamela S. Nellis, William R. Nellis and Nellis Realty, LLC
Plaintiff: William J. Moss, lll and Judy R. Moss
Case Number: 2:2012cv00002
Filed: February 10, 2012
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Bryson City Office
County: Macon
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion to Substitute Party; The Court DIRECTS the parties to Show Cause in writing within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order whether Appalachian Golf Cars, LLC should remain a Third Party Defendant. Le Bon Temps Roule', LLC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/27/12. (nll)
July 27, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 39 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 07/26/12. (emw)
July 31, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Terry B. Millar for Judy R. Moss & William J. Moss, lll. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/31/12. (ejb)
September 5, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before September 21, 2012, defendants The Birches of Wildcat Cliffs, LLC and Nellis Realty, LLC and third-party defendant Le Bon Temps Roule', LLC d/b/a Appalachian Golf Cars, LLC shall file a response. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/5/12. (nll)
September 5, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Motion to Intervene. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/5/12. (nll)
March 29, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 70 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/29/13. (nll)
April 15, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/12/13. (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss et al v. Nellis et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birches of Wildcat Cliffs, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela S. Nellis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Nellis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nellis Realty, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Moss, lll
Represented By: Gary Stephen Hemric
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy R. Moss
Represented By: Gary Stephen Hemric
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]