Bostic, et al v. Mader, et al

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Bostic and Jenny Bostic
Defendant: Johanna Mader and Elyse Mader
Case Number: 2:2012cv00087
Filed: November 21, 2012
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Bryson City Office
County: Swain
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 23:134 P.I.- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 02/12/13. (emw)
March 14, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Dismiss Pltfs' claims for punitive damages against the Defts; FURTHER ORDERED Pltfs' claims against Deft Johanna Mader are DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/14/13. (ejb)
March 14, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER parties shall file the Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference on or before 3/20/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/14/13. (ejb)
May 23, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion to Intervene and the Answer to Amended Complaint with Counterclaim is hereby deemed filed. ORDERED that the time within which to reply to the Counterclaim shall commence from the filing of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before fifteen (15) days from entry of this Order, Nationwide may file response to the Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration 29 . Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/22/2013. (thh)
August 13, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion for Reconsideration. The Courts Order 24 granting Defendants' Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Claims for Punitive Damages and Plaintiffs' Claims against Defendant Johanna Mader in the First Amended Complaint is AFFIRMED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 08/12/2013. (thh)
November 6, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denies without prejudice 46 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/06/2013. (thh)
December 16, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within 30 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/16/2013. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bostic, et al v. Mader, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Bostic
Represented By: Curtis Elliot Bostic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Bostic
Represented By: Curtis Elliot Bostic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johanna Mader
Represented By: Michael Paul Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elyse Mader
Represented By: Michael Paul Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]