Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC v. Frontier Communications of the Carolinas, LLC

Plaintiff: Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC
Defendant: Frontier Communications of the Carolinas, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00040
Filed: October 18, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Bryson City Office
County: Macon
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: Diversity - Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/9/13. (nll)
December 10, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/10/2013. (thh)
January 8, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Claire J. Evans for Frontier Communications of the Carolinas, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/08/14. (emw)
January 8, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Joseph J. Starsick, Jr for Frontier Communications of the Carolinas, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/08/14. (emw)
January 8, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Christopher S. Huther for Frontier Communications of the Carolinas, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/08/14. (emw)
July 15, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 07/15/14. (emw)
August 6, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion to Strike the Supplemental Memorandum 37 ; granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Transfer and Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 08/06/2014. (thh)
August 7, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before August 28, 2014, the Plaintiff shall file a response disclosing the names and citizenships. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 08/07/2014. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC v. Frontier Communications of the Carolinas, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC
Represented By: Matthew G.T. Martin(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Communications of the Carolinas, LLC
Represented By: W. Perry Fisher, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]