Prospect Capital Corporation et al v. Cole et al

Plaintiff: Prospect Capital Corporation
Defendant: Charles J. Cole, Nathan M. Bender, David C. Eppling, Jacob Cole, John M. Mitchell, Shelton Smith, Sandra Dee Cole, Michael Anthony Habowski, Dennis M. Molesevich, Tracey Hawley, Cherry Bekaert & Holland LLP, Elliot & Warren, Adkisson, Sherbert & Associates, Houlihan Smith and Suntrust Banks, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv00546
Filed: December 30, 2009
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: XX, Outside State
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER:#98375 For the foregoing reasons, the Defendants' motions to transfer venue are GRANTED. The Clerk of this Court is instructed to sever Count XII for professional negligence against Banull and transfer it to the Eastern Distric t of Pennsylvania. The Clerk is further instructed to transfer the remaining causes of action against all Defendants to the Western District of North Carolina. Finally, the Clerk of this Court is directed to remove this case from my docket. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 12/21/2009) (jpo) Modified on 12/22/2009 (eef). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/30/2009.]
January 4, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 108 and 109 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Ann W. Ferbee and Thomas S. Richey for Nathan M. Bender, Jacob Cole, David C. Eppling, Tracey Hawley, John M. Mitchell, Shelton Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/4/2010. (tmg)
January 7, 2010 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 112 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added R. Paul Childress, Jr for Cherry Bekaert & Holland LLP. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/7/2009. (tmg)
January 7, 2010 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 113 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added William H. Major III for Suntrust Banks, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/7/2010. (tmg)
January 7, 2010 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 114 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added David H. Wilson for Suntrust Banks, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/7/2010. (tmg)
January 8, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 119 and 120 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Richard P. Drake and Justin Joseph D'Elia for Houlihan Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/8/2010. (tmg)
January 19, 2010 125 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER granting Substitution of Attorney for Adkisson, Sherbert & Associates. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/19/2010. (tmg)
January 20, 2010 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 126 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Katrina Clark Forrest for Cherry Bekaert & Holland LLP. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/20/2010. (tmg)
February 3, 2010 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 130 , 131 , 132 , 133 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added H. Marc Tepper, Gregory Krock, Christopher Schueller, Lindsay M. Bard for Prospect Capital Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/3/2010. (tmg)
April 15, 2010 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 143 Motion for Briefing Schedule as to Motions to Dismiss. Any party desiring to file a supplemental brief with respect to pending motions to dismiss shall file said brief no later than April 30, 2010, with any responsive briefs due in accordance with LCvR 7.1. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 4/15/10. (gpb)
September 1, 2011 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 168 Motion for Leave to Permit Early Discovery Between Plaintiff and SunTrust Banks, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/1/2011. (tmg)
September 2, 2011 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Consolidating Cases for Discovery. All further pretrial pleadings to be docketed to: 3:09-cv-465 until the consolidation is severed. Member Case: 3:09-cv-546 to remain open. It is FURTHER ORDERED that- (1) Prospect Capit al Corporation's (#6) MOTION to Dismiss filed in 3:09-cv-465 is denied without prejudice and a new motion to dismiss may be filed on 10/4/11. If such is not filed by such date, the parties to such action shall file a CIAC, a Rule 41 dismissal, o r other pleading by such date moving this action forward; (2) Cherry, Beckaert & Holland L.L.P.'s and Elliot & Warren's 52 MOTION to Dismiss filed in 3:09-cv-546 is GRANTED, and the action against these defendants is dismissed without pre judice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; (3) Adkisson, Sherbert & Associates's Motion to Dismiss 52 filed in 3:09cv546 is DENIED without prejudice, and Prospect is GRANTED leave to file an Amended Complaint within 14 days as instructed in this Order; (4) Defendant Dennis M. Molesevich's and Defendant Sandra Dee Cole's MOTION 56 filed in 3:09cv546 is DENIED without prejudice, and Prospect is GRANTED to leave to file an Amended Complaint within 14 days as instructed in th is Order; (5) the Motion to Dismiss 56 filed in 3:09cv546 is otherwise DENIED without prejudice. The ESA defendants who have reached a settlement with Prospect in 3:09cv546 may file a new motion on October 4, 2011, if their settlement is not approv ed by that date. If such is not filed, the parties to this action shall file a CIAC, a Rule 41 dismissal, or other pleading by such date that moves this action forward. These consolidated actions are referred to Magistrate Judge Keesler for pretrial management and consideration of all future motions short of summary judgment. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/2/11.(gpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Prospect Capital Corporation et al v. Cole et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prospect Capital Corporation
Represented By: Christopher P. Schueller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles J. Cole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan M. Bender
Represented By: Noah Weissman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Eppling
Represented By: Noah Weissman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Cole
Represented By: Noah Weissman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Mitchell
Represented By: Noah Weissman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelton Smith
Represented By: Noah Weissman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Dee Cole
Represented By: Partha Pratim Chattoraj
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Anthony Habowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis M. Molesevich
Represented By: Kathy K. Condo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Hawley
Represented By: Noah Weissman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry Bekaert & Holland LLP
Represented By: Ronald S. Herzog
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot & Warren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adkisson, Sherbert & Associates
Represented By: Michael Francis Lynch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houlihan Smith
Represented By: Richard P. Darke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Banks, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]