Pappas et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Evanthia F Pappas and Michael R Dean
Defendant: United States of America
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv00016
Filed: January 13, 2010
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2010 11 Featured Case ORDER granting Permission to File Surreply as to 6 Motion to Dismiss. Surreply due 5/15/2010. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/14/2010. (tmg)
July 7, 2010 13 Featured Case ORDER re 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.( Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.) Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/7/2010. (cw)
July 30, 2010 14 Featured Case ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction for the reasons stated in the July 29, 2010 hearing. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/30/2010. (cw)
September 14, 2011 31 Featured Case ORDER denying 21 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 23 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/14/2011. (tmg)
September 26, 2011 33 Featured Case ORDER (Jury Trial re-set for 12/12/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/26/2011. (tmg)
December 7, 2011 65 Featured Case ORDER denying 51 Motion to Strike Proposed Voir Dire Question No. 8. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/7/2011. (tmg)
December 13, 2011 68 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion in Limine to Exclude a Government Witness and Objections to Defendants Proposed Exhibits. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/13/2011. (tmg)
December 13, 2011 69 Featured Case ORDER denying 52 Motion in Limine to Preclude the Plaintiffs From Offering Any Evidence Concerning Its Refund Claim Allegedly Granted By the North Carolina Department of Revenue. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/13/2011. (tmg)
December 13, 2011 70 Featured Case ORDER granting 53 Motion in Limine to Preclude Submission of Plaintiffs' Issues No. 1(A) and (B) to the Jury. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/13/2011. (tmg)
December 13, 2011 71 Featured Case ORDER granting 54 Motion in Limine to Preclude Submission of Plaintiffs Issue No. 3 to the Jury. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/13/2011. (tmg)
December 13, 2011 73 Featured Case JUDGMENT in favor of Evanthia F Pappas, Michael R Dean against United States of America. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/13/11. (clc)
February 22, 2012 89 Featured Case ORDER that the hearing scheduled for 3/1/2012 re: Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs is hereby CANCELLED. The Court will defer ruling pending resolution of the Appeal. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/22/2012. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pappas et al v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanthia F Pappas
Represented By: E. Fitzgerald Parnell, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R Dean
Represented By: E. Fitzgerald Parnell, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]