Goodrich Corporation v. The United States of America

Plaintiff: Goodrich Corporation
Defendant: The United States of America
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv00105
Filed: March 9, 2010
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2010 20 Featured Case ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Thomas Kevin Spencer for Goodrich Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/20/10. (gpb)
July 20, 2010 21 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Elizabeth Erickson for Goodrich Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/20/10. (gpb)
July 20, 2010 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Justin M. Holmes for Goodrich Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/20/10. (gpb)
January 18, 2012 52 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part 29 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 30 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/18/12. (tob)
January 23, 2012 53 Featured Case ORDER continuing the trial set for February 15, 2012 until further notice of the Court. It is further ordered that matter is STAYED 60 days until Friday, March 23, 2012. Counsel shall submit a joint status report no later than Friday, March 23, 2012 as to whether or not this matter should be calendared for trial. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/23/12. (chh)
October 9, 2012 60 Featured Case ORDER: The Court DENIES the parties request for (60) additional days and instead will allow the parties (30) calendar days from the date of this Order to complete their calculations and advise as to whether trial in this matter will be necessary. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/9/2012. (tmg)
November 9, 2012 63 Featured Case ORDER (Bench Trial set for mixed term beginning 3/11/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney.) A pretrial conference will be scheduled during the week of February 19-22, 2013, at a date and time to be noticed by the Court. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 11/8/2012. (tmg)
February 21, 2013 68 Featured Case ORDER granting 67 Motion for Entry of Judgment. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/21/13. (clc)
February 21, 2013 69 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 1/18/12 & 2/21/13. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns.. Entered by direction of Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/21/13. (clc)
March 9, 2010 6 Featured Case ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Jean A. Pawlow for Goodrich Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/9/10. (gpb)
March 9, 2010 7 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Bobby Roy Burchfield for Goodrich Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/9/10. (gpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Goodrich Corporation v. The United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: Bobby Roy Burchfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]