Bridgetree, Inc. et al v. RED F Marketing LLC et al

Plaintiff: Bridgetree, Inc. and Two Bit Dog, LLC
Defendant: RED F Marketing LLC, Target Point, LLC, Daniel Roselli, Teng Li, Jason Li, Mali Xu, Mark Epperly and Elton T. Scripter
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv00228
Filed: May 18, 2010
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Alexander
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2012 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 101 Motion to Compel; denying 101 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/3/2012. (tmg)
February 23, 2012 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Extending Dispositive Motions Deadline (Motions due by 3/9/2012). Oral Argument/Hearing set for 4/11/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney). Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/23/2012. (tmg)
March 15, 2012 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 102 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/15/2012. (tmg)
May 21, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 , 15 , 16 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Steven C. Schroer,Edward W. Gray,Christian R. Eriksen for Bridgetree, Inc. and Two Bit Dog, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/21/2010. (bsw)
August 13, 2012 199 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Jury Verdicts dated 8/10/12. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 8/13/12. (clc)
May 24, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated ORDER to perserve and produce evidence in advance of further proceedings granting 18 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/24/2010. (bsw)
September 11, 2012 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 220 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/11/2012. (blf)
October 19, 2012 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to withdrawreference of the following three cases from the Bankruptcy Court: RedF Marketing, LLC (Case No.12-32462 (JCW)), Target Point, LLC (Case No. 12-32463 (JCW)), and Mr. Daniel Roselli (CaseNo. 12-32461 (JCW)). Lifting Bankruptcy Stay. Stay pursuant to 11U.S.C. § 362 otherwise remains in full effect.. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/19/2012. (blf)
December 21, 2012 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for memorandum of law no later than 1/9/2013. Responsive pleadings due 1/14/2013. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 12/20/2012. (blf)
January 9, 2013 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 247 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney George Sibley added for all defendants.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/8/2013. (blf)
February 5, 2013 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 209 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying as moot 215 Motion to Stay; denying 217 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 217 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 217 Motion for New Trial; granting in part and denying in part 218 Motion to Alter Judgment; granting 223 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/5/2013. (blf)
August 22, 2013 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Evidentiary Hearing on 269 MOTION for Order to Show Cause , ( Evidentiary Hearing set for 9/3/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.). Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/22/2013. (eef)
September 12, 2013 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 290 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Craig V. Gabbert for CustomerStream, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/12/2013. (blf)
August 18, 2014 312 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 311 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added D. Alexander Fardon for CustomerStream, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 08/16/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
August 6, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' claims. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/5/2010. (cw)
October 7, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion to Compel Attendance at a Rule 26(f) Initial Attorneys' Conference. IAC to be held by 10/12/2010. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/7/2010. (tmg)
October 26, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 and 64 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Mark A. Borsos and Christine Abuel Pompa for Bridgetree, Inc., Two Bit Dog, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/26/2010. (tmg)
February 25, 2011 72 Opinion or Order of the Court Vacated and Withdrawn - ORDER. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/25/2011. (tmg) Modified on 2/25/2011 per text only order this order was vacated and withdrawn (com).
March 23, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 Defendants' Joint Motion for Order Permitting Discovery Between Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/23/11. (chh)
September 16, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 84 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Jason Li and Mali Xu. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/16/11. (gpb)
October 28, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs shall provide complete responses to the discovery requests as stated in Order within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/28/2011. (tmg)
November 9, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs shall produce documents as stated in Order on or before 11/15/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/9/2011. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bridgetree, Inc. et al v. RED F Marketing LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgetree, Inc.
Represented By: J. Mark Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Two Bit Dog, LLC
Represented By: J. Mark Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RED F Marketing LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Point, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Roselli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teng Li
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Li
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mali Xu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Epperly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elton T. Scripter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]