Taylor v. Lubin et al

Plaintiff: John W. Taylor
Defendant: Scott R Lubin and Angela R Lubin
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv00566
Filed: November 9, 2010
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Alexander
 
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Order of Commitment is WITHDRAWN based on a purging of civil contempt, reference of this matter is returned to the Bankruptcy Court, and this action is TERMINATED. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 6/6/2011. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
March 18, 2011 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER accepting Withdrawal of Reference for the purpose of enforcement of the Order of civil contempt; debtors SCOTT LUBIN and ANGELA LUBIN are committed to the custody of the US Marshal, such Order of commitment and arrest is STAYED for 30 days, The US Marshal is hereby directed to personally serve debtors with a copy of this Order. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/18/2011. (tmg)
May 10, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying the Order of commitment and arrest until 5/27/2011. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 5/10/11. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(bsw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Taylor v. Lubin et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott R Lubin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela R Lubin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]