US Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. PMC Strategy, LLC et al

Plaintiff: US Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: PMC Strategy, LLC, Michael Hudspeth and Timothy Bailey
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00073
Filed: February 9, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 7:6
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2011 12 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER of PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and for other equitable relief against defendant Timothy Bailey. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/3/2011. (tmg)
April 21, 2011 22 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER of PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and for other equitable relief against defendant Michael Hudspeth. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/21/2011. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg) Modified on 4/21/2011 (tmg).
May 26, 2011 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 24 Motion to Set Aside Default as to Defendant Hudspeth. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/26/11. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(bsw)
October 18, 2012 41 Featured Case Order of Default Judgment, Permanent Injunction, Civil Monetary Penalties, and Ancillary Equitable Relief against Defendants PMC Strategy, LLC and Timothy Bailey re: 33 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/18/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
October 18, 2012 42 Featured Case ORDER denying 37 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/18/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
November 19, 2012 48 Featured Case ORDER denying 43 Motion to Vacate 42 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/19/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
February 9, 2011 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 1 Motion to Seal Case. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/9/2011. (tmg)
December 6, 2012 50 Featured Case ORDER re 32 Order on Motion, ( Motions due by 2/4/2013., Bench Trial re-set for 5/6/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/6/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef) Modified text on 12/6/2012 (eef).
February 9, 2011 5 Featured Case STATUTORY RESTRAINING ORDER freezing assets and preserving books and records; ORDER granting expedited discovery; ORDER requiring defendants to show cause regarding Preliminary Injunction re: 3 Motion. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/9/2011. (tmg)
April 3, 2013 63 Featured Case ORDER denying 52 Motion for Release of Funds; denying 53 Motion to Compel; granting 55 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 61 Motion to Compel. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/3/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
April 3, 2013 64 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 4/3/2013. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: US Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. PMC Strategy, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Richard Glaser
Represented By: Daniel C. Jordan
Represented By: Eugenia Vroustouris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMC Strategy, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hudspeth
Represented By: John Francis Hanzel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Bailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]