Rivera v. Central Transport Intl

Plaintiff: Mario-Mateo Rivera
Defendant: Central Transport Intl
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00091
Filed: February 22, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2011 13 Featured Case ORDER for Plaintiff to file a Response as to 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Responses due by 12/14/2011.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/30/11. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail, certified 7003 1010 0003 5291 2914.)(gpb)
January 4, 2012 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/4/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(bsw)
January 4, 2012 16 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated January 4, 2012. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(bsw)
August 18, 2011 7 Featured Case ORDER, ( Jury Trial rescheduled for 2/6/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/18/2011. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(bsw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rivera v. Central Transport Intl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario-Mateo Rivera
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Transport Intl
Represented By: William Randolph Loftis
Represented By: William J. McMahon, IV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]