Tierney v. Wyeth

Defendant: Wyeth
Plaintiff: Jame Charlea Tierney
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00232
Filed: May 11, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: XX, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Arnold Anderson Vickery for Jame Charlea Tierney. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/8/2011. (tmg)
June 27, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Andrew C. Efaw for Wyeth. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/27/11. (com)
June 27, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Sean G. Saxon for Wyeth. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/27/11. (com)
July 25, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Status Conference set for 9/14/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/25/2011. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tierney v. Wyeth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth
Represented By: Reetu Dandora
Represented By: Ira S. Lefton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jame Charlea Tierney
Represented By: Arnold Anderson Vickery
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]