Chumbley v. Wyeth

Defendant: Wyeth
Plaintiff: Leah Craig Chumbley
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00343
Filed: July 15, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: XX, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Andrew C.S. Efaw for Wyeth. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/22/11. (gpb)
July 22, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Sean G. Saxon for Wyeth. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/22/11. (gpb)
July 26, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Arnold Anderson Vickery. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/26/2011. (bsw)
October 12, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Status Conference set for 11/9/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/12/2011. (tmg)
December 8, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Megan A. Jones for Wyeth. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/8/11. (gpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Chumbley v. Wyeth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth
Represented By: Reetu Dandora
Represented By: Andrew C.S. Efaw
Represented By: Ira S. Lefton
Represented By: Paul Joseph Osowski
Represented By: Sean G. Saxon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Craig Chumbley
Represented By: Arnold Anderson Vickery
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]