Bey v. Simpson et al

Defendant: Jessie B. Caldwell, Dover Mortgage Company, David A. Simpson and Citimortgage, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Allen Bey
Case Number: 3:2011cv00349
Filed: July 20, 2011
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Plaintiff's Response to Motion 4 due by 9/26/2011.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/12/11. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail, certified 7003 1010 0003 5291 2846.)(gpb)
November 14, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as to 14 MOTION to Dismiss . (Responses due by 11/23/2011). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/10/2011. (Pro se litigant served by certified US Mail 7008 1830 0001 4376 8684) (tmg)
January 18, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 13 & 21 Memorandum and Recommendations; granting 4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jessie B. Caldwell; granting 14 Motion to Dismiss filed by Citimortgage, Inc. Plaintiff must show cause within (14) days why her case against Defendant Simpson and Defendant Dover Mortgage Company should not be dismissed for failure to timely serve them. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 1/17/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
February 8, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 2/8/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
February 8, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Orders dated January 18, 2012 and February 8, 2012. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bey v. Simpson et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie B. Caldwell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dover Mortgage Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Simpson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citimortgage, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Allen Bey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]