Narog et al v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al

Defendant: LaSalle Bank National Association, Chicago Title Insurance Company, Federal National Mortgage Association and Bank of America Home Loan Servicing LP
Plaintiff: Kim Narog and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2011cv00429
Filed: September 2, 2011
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Gaston
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim .(Plaintiff's Response to Motion 8 due by 11/18/2011.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/2/11. (Pro se litigant Kim Narog served by US Mail, certified 7003 1010 0003 5291 2891.)(gpb)
December 1, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Strike, 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim .(Plaintiff's Responses due by 12/12/2011.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/1/11. (Pro se litigant Kim Narog served by US Mail, certified 7003 1010 0003 5291 2938.)(gpb)
January 18, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 18 Memorandum and Recommendations; granting 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Chicago Title Insurance Company; granting 12 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike by Bank of America H ome Loan Servicing LP, Federal National Mortgage Association. Plaintiffs are warned that if they do not serve their Complaint on the remaining defendants within (14) days, their case will be DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to provide the Court with updated contact information within (14) days. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 1/17/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
February 8, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 2/8/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Narog et al v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaSalle Bank National Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Home Loan Servicing LP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Narog
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]