James et al v. Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Betty James and Willie James
Defendant: Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc. and Deidre D. DeFlorentis
Case Number: 3:2011cv00498
Filed: October 6, 2011
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Union
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; affirming 14 Memorandum and Recommendations.. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 2/10/12. (chh)
February 14, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 2/10/12. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (chh)
October 14, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings until 11/17/2011; granting 5 Motion to Stay until 11/17/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/14/2011. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James et al v. Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty James
Represented By: Stephanie M. Ceccato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie James
Represented By: Stephanie M. Ceccato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Samuel Dowdy
Represented By: Thomas Carlton Younger, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deidre D. DeFlorentis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.