Wagner v. The United States of America

Plaintiff: William Wagner
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2012cv00130
Filed: February 27, 2012
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Alexander
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion for privacy act order. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/12/2013. (blf)
November 21, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, ( Jury Trial set for 3/24/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/21/2013. (blf)
January 15, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding trial. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/15/2014. (blf)
March 14, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER sua sponte for the scheduling of a Judicial Settlement Conference. ( Settlement Conference set for 3/20/2014 12:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Magistrate Judge David Keesler.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/14/2014. (eef) Modified text on 3/14/2014 (eef).
April 2, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on a Bench Trial held. The Court finds in favor of the Defendant. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/2/2014. (tmg)
April 2, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated April 2, 2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (tmg)
August 21, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 08/21/2014. (jlk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. The United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Wagner
Represented By: Marcus S. McGee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]