ABT, Inc. v. ACO Polymer Products, Inc.

Defendant: ACO Polymer Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: ABT, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00154
Filed: March 9, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 Motion to Stay Pending Early Mediation. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/4/2012. (tmg)
July 24, 2012 14 Featured Case ORDER, setting Status Conference for 8/16/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/24/12. (com)
July 31, 2012 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Amelia J. Workman Farago for ACO Polymer Products, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/31/12. (com)
August 13, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER: Status Conference reset for 8/22/2012 02:00 PM in Chambers before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/13/12. (com)
January 17, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 Motion for stipulation and protective order. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/17/2013. (blf)
March 14, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Philip Bautista for ACO Polymer Products, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/14/2012. (tmg)
March 14, 2012 7 Featured Case ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Patrick J. Krebs for ACO Polymer Products, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/14/2012. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ABT, Inc. v. ACO Polymer Products, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACO Polymer Products, Inc.
Represented By: Philip R. Bautista
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Represented By: Patrick J. Krebs
Represented By: Jonathan C. Krisko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABT, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Javier Peralta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]