Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Ahluwalia et al

Defendant: Jose Leonardo Jimenez, Jane Doe and Dheeraj Ahluwalia
Plaintiff: Onewest Bank, FSB and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00237
Filed: April 19, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:1821
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 12 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/22/2013. (eef)
February 26, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion to Seal. Plaintiffs to file DBNTC's Loan Inventory Record under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/26/13. (bsw)
May 14, 2013 35 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and OneWest Bank FSB against Dheeraj Ahluwalia. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/14/2013. (eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Ahluwalia et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Leonardo Jimenez
Represented By: Michael F Schultze
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dheeraj Ahluwalia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onewest Bank, FSB
Represented By: Heather C. White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Heather C. White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]