Cohen v. Swisher Hygiene, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Michael B. Cohen
Defendant: Swisher Hygiene, Inc., Steven R. Berrard and Michael J. Kipp
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00256
Filed: April 25, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Alexander
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Scott D. Musoff and Jay B. Kasner for Steven R. Berrard, Michael J. Kipp,and Swisher Hygiene, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 05/09/2012. (blf)
May 18, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Consolidating Cases for Trial. All further pleadings to be docketed to: 3:12-cv-216. Member Case: 3:12-cv-221, 3:12-cv-256 to be administratively closed. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/18/2012. (blf)
August 6, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT (Filed in MDL Master 3:12-md-2384 as Doc. No. 104). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/6/2014. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cohen v. Swisher Hygiene, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael B. Cohen
Represented By: Gary W. Jackson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swisher Hygiene, Inc.
Represented By: James Patrick McLoughlin, Jr.
Represented By: Valecia M. McDowell
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Watkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven R. Berrard
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Valecia M. McDowell
Represented By: James Patrick McLoughlin, Jr.
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Kipp
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Represented By: Valecia M. McDowell
Represented By: James Patrick McLoughlin, Jr.
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]