Nieman v. Duke Energy Corporation et al

Defendant: Steven K. Young, William Barnet, IIl, G. Alex Bernhardt, Sr., James T. Rhodes, Philip R. Sharp, Michael G. Browning, Daniel R. DiMicco, John H. Forsgren, Ann Maynard Grey, Duke Energy Corporation, James E. Rogers, E. James Reinsch, James H. Hance, Jr. and Lynn J. Good
Plaintiff: Maurine Nieman
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00456
Filed: July 24, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2012 10 Featured Case ORDER granting oral Motion to Consolidate Cases for Discovery andTrial. All further pleadings to be electronically filed to:3:12-cv-456 only. Member Case: 3:12-cv-474 to be administratively closed. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 9/10/2012. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00456-MOC-DSC, 3:12-cv-00474-FDW-DSC(blf)
October 5, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added David A. Rosenfeld for Amlagamated Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/5/2012. (blf)
October 10, 2012 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Ramzi Abadou for Duke Investors. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/10/2012. (blf)
October 17, 2012 35 Featured Case ORDER granting (28) Motion to Consolidate Cases for DiscoveryTrial. All further pleadings to be electronically filed to: 3:12cv456 only. Member Case: 3:12cv474, 3:12cv624 to be administratively closed in case 3:12-cv-00456-MOC-DSC. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 10/16/2012. (eef)
December 7, 2012 43 Featured Case ORDER granting 42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jennifer Sarnelli for Maurine Nieman. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/6/2012. (blf)
December 17, 2012 47 Featured Case ORDER granting 44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Paul Jeffrey Geller for Amlagamated Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/12/2012. (blf)
December 18, 2012 50 Featured Case ORDER granting 48 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Elizabeth A. Shonson for Amlagamated Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/17/2012. (blf)
December 19, 2012 54 Featured Case ORDER granting 51 52 53 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Erik Peterson,Stacey Kaplan,Eli Greenstein for Duke Investors. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/19/2012. (blf)
December 20, 2012 55 Featured Case ORDER granting 49 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added David J. George for Amlagamated Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/19/2012. (blf)
January 25, 2013 57 Featured Case ORDER granting 56 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Tor Gronborg for Amlagamated Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/25/2013. (eef)
September 4, 2013 77 Featured Case ORDER, ( Oral Argument set for 10/2/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr.). Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/3/2013. (blf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nieman v. Duke Energy Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven K. Young
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barnet, IIl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Alex Bernhardt, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T. Rhodes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip R. Sharp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G. Browning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel R. DiMicco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Forsgren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Maynard Grey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Rogers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. James Reinsch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H. Hance, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn J. Good
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurine Nieman
Represented By: William Everett Moore, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]