Meineke Car Care Centers, Inc. et al v. Abomb Results, LLC et al

Plaintiff: EconoLube N' Tune, Inc. and Meineke Car Care Centers, Inc.
Defendant: Abomb Results, LLC, Melissa Ortiz and Adam Reich
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00760
Filed: November 14, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Alexander
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 31:3731 Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties are expected to follow this Courts orders and are advised to attend to their cases conscientiously. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/10/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
August 28, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Response to Order to Show Cause. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/28/2013. (blf)
December 7, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Dennis Dean Leone for EconoLube N' Tune, Inc., and Meineke Car Care Centers, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/7/2012. (eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Meineke Car Care Centers, Inc. et al v. Abomb Results, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EconoLube N' Tune, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Tkach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meineke Car Care Centers, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Tkach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abomb Results, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Ortiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Reich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]