Belsome et al v. Rex Venture Group LLC et al

Intervenor: Kenneth D. Bell
Defendant: Rex Venture Group, LLC and Paul R. Burks
Plaintiff: Johnny Belsome, Timothy Allen, Jody Hinkley, Donald Marcel, Keith Hinkley, Starr Atchison, Edward Thiel, Brett Hunter and Tara Belsome
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00800
Filed: December 4, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: XX, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2012 41 Featured Case ORDER & REASONS: ORDERED that Intervenor Kenneth Bell's and Defendant Paul Burks' Motions to Stay and Transfer (Rec. Docs. 13 , 19 ) are GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 12/3/12.(sek, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/4/2012.]
January 14, 2013 45 Featured Case ORDER granting 44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/14/2013. (blf)
July 3, 2013 46 Featured Case ORDER STAYING CASE re: 13 Motion to stay. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/3/2013. (tmg)
September 25, 2013 51 Featured Case ORDER granting 47 Motion to Lift Stay. Receiver and Defendant Burks directed to respond substantively to the arguments made by Plaintiffs herein within 14 days. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/25/2013. (blf)
December 30, 2013 56 Featured Case ORDER denying 47 Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/30/2013. (blf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Belsome et al v. Rex Venture Group LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Kenneth D. Bell
Represented By: Judy Y. Barrasso
Represented By: Irving M. Brenner
Represented By: Sarah L. Rubin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Venture Group, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth D. Bell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul R. Burks
Represented By: Noell P. Tin
Represented By: Jacob H. Sussman
Represented By: Rachel I. Conner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Belsome
Represented By: Marc R. Michaud
Represented By: James W. Kilbourne, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Allen
Represented By: James W. Kilbourne, Jr.
Represented By: Marc R. Michaud
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Hinkley
Represented By: Marc R. Michaud
Represented By: James W. Kilbourne, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Marcel
Represented By: Marc R. Michaud
Represented By: James W. Kilbourne, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Hinkley
Represented By: James W. Kilbourne, Jr.
Represented By: Marc R. Michaud
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Atchison
Represented By: James W. Kilbourne, Jr.
Represented By: Marc R. Michaud
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Thiel
Represented By: James W. Kilbourne, Jr.
Represented By: Marc R. Michaud
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Hunter
Represented By: James W. Kilbourne, Jr.
Represented By: Marc R. Michaud
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Belsome
Represented By: James W. Kilbourne, Jr.
Represented By: Marc R. Michaud
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]