Agdata, L.P. v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company

Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Agdata, L.P.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00052
Filed: January 25, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michael Douglas Mulvaney,Christopher Charles Frost for Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/21/2013. (blf)
June 12, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/11/2013. (blf)
June 14, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added John A. Little, Jr for Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/13/2013. (blf)
October 15, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jeffrey M. Granthan for Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/15/2013. (blf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Agdata, L.P. v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agdata, L.P.
Represented By: Adam Samuel Hocutt
Represented By: W. Joseph Dozier, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]