CompuFill, LLC v. Harris Teeter, Inc.

Plaintiff: CompuFill, LLC
Defendant: Harris Teeter, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00097
Filed: February 14, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Charles S. Barquist for Harris Teeter, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/18/2013. (eef)
April 18, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Wendy J. Ray for Harris Teeter, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/18/2013. (eef)
October 8, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Todd Young Brandt for CompuFill, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/8/2013. (eef)
February 21, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Darrell G. Dotson for CompuFill, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/21/13. (bsw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CompuFill, LLC v. Harris Teeter, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CompuFill, LLC
Represented By: Darrell G. Dotson
Represented By: Susan Freya Olive
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris Teeter, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley R. Kutrow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]