Pipefitters Local No. 636 Defined Benefit Pension Fund v. Family Dollar Stores, Inc. et al

Defendant: Howard R. Levine, Mary A. Winston, Family Dollar Stores, Inc. and Michael K. Bloom
Plaintiff: Pipefitters Local No. 636 Defined Benefit Pension Fund
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00116
Filed: February 21, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michael R. Smith for Michael K. Bloom,Family Dollar Stores, Inc.,Howard R. Levine, Mary A. Winston. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/7/2013. (blf)
May 7, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Emily Shoemaker for Michael K. Bloom,Family Dollar Stores, Inc.,Howard R. Levine, Mary A. Winston. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/7/2013. (blf)
May 7, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Benjamin Lee for Michael K. Bloom, Family Dollar Stores, Inc., Howard R. Levine, Mary A. Winston. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/7/2013. (blf)
May 10, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kathleen L. Barber for Pipefitters Local No. 636 Defined Benefit Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/10/2013. (blf)
May 10, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Robert J. Robbins for Pipefitters Local No. 636 Defined Benefit Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/10/2013. (blf)
May 10, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Rachel L Jensen for Pipefitters Local No. 636 Defined Benefit Pension Fund, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/10/2013. (blf)
May 24, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Stay motion to dismiss.. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 5/23/2013. (blf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pipefitters Local No. 636 Defined Benefit Pension Fund v. Family Dollar Stores, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard R. Levine
Represented By: Adam Karl Doerr
Represented By: Benjamin Lee
Represented By: Emily L. Shoemaker
Represented By: Michael R. Smith
Represented By: John R. Wester
Represented By: David Calep Wright, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary A. Winston
Represented By: Adam Karl Doerr
Represented By: Benjamin Lee
Represented By: Emily L. Shoemaker
Represented By: Michael R. Smith
Represented By: John R. Wester
Represented By: David Calep Wright, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Karl Doerr
Represented By: Benjamin Lee
Represented By: Emily L. Shoemaker
Represented By: Michael R. Smith
Represented By: John R. Wester
Represented By: David Calep Wright, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael K. Bloom
Represented By: Adam Karl Doerr
Represented By: Benjamin Lee
Represented By: Emily L. Shoemaker
Represented By: Michael R. Smith
Represented By: John R. Wester
Represented By: David Calep Wright, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipefitters Local No. 636 Defined Benefit Pension Fund
Represented By: Kathleen Lee Barber
Represented By: Dhamian A. Blue
Represented By: Rachel Lynn Jensen
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Robbins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]