Tropical Nut & Fruit Co. v. Forward Foods, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Tropical Nut & Fruit Co.
Defendant: Forward Foods, LLC and Recharge Foods, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00131
Filed: February 26, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Mark E. Avsec for Forward Foods, LLC and Recharge Foods, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/27/2013. (eef)
March 27, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Susan E. Clady for Forward Foods, LLC and Recharge Foods, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/27/2013. (eef)
March 27, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Julie R. Fenstermaker for Forward Foods, LLC and Recharge Foods, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/27/2013. (eef)
June 10, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER granting only to the limited extent 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/10/2013. (eef)
July 16, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 23 Motion to Dismiss Count I of Defendants Counterclaims and to Strike Defendants Second and Third Defenses. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/16/2013. (eef)
September 13, 2013 41 Featured Case STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND ORDER VACATING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 9/13/2013. (eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tropical Nut & Fruit Co. v. Forward Foods, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tropical Nut & Fruit Co.
Represented By: Alice Carmichael Richey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forward Foods, LLC
Represented By: Mark E. Avsec
Represented By: Susan E. Clady
Represented By: Julie R. Fenstermaker
Represented By: Mark Peter Henriques
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recharge Foods, LLC
Represented By: Mark E. Avsec
Represented By: Susan E. Clady
Represented By: Julie R. Fenstermaker
Represented By: Mark Peter Henriques
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]