United States of America v. Shenzhen Development Bank et al

Defendant: Hong Kong and Shanghai Banking Corporation and Shenzhen Development Bank
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00152
Filed: March 12, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
 
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21:0881 Property Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Alexander J. Willscher for Hong Kong and Shanghai Banking Corporation. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/23/2013. (blf)
June 13, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Steven R. Glaser for Ping An Bank. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/12/2013. (blf)
June 13, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Megan P. Tosner for Ping An Bank. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/12/2013. (blf)
June 21, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court Consent ORDER for third party claim re 23 Miscellaneous Filing. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/21/2013. (blf)
July 23, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion for consent order for third party claim. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/23/2013. (blf)
November 26, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/26/2013. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Shenzhen Development Bank et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Kong and Shanghai Banking Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Development Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Benjamin Bain-Creed
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]